TN HB1283 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-30 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, clarifies that an individual exemption of $33,000 or a joint exemption of $59,000 applies for Hall Income taxpayers who are 65 years of age or older. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 2, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, clarifies that an individual exemption of $33,000 or a joint exemption of $59,000 applies for Hall Income taxpayers who are 65 years of age or older. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 2, Part 1.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-30HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-03-25HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2015-03-18HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/25/2015
2015-03-09HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-03-04HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2015-02-25HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/4/2015
2015-02-24HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2015-02-23HouseP2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2015-02-18HouseP1C.
2015-02-12HouseIntro.
2015-02-12HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1311 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Revenue Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback