TN HB1279 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-17 - Assigned to s/c Consumer Affairs of C&EA
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-17 - Assigned to s/c Consumer Affairs of C&EA
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Uniform Debt Management Services Act." - Amends TCA Title 47.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Uniform Debt Management Services Act." - Amends TCA Title 47.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-17 | Assigned to s/c Consumer Affairs of C&EA | |
2009-02-19 | P2C, ref. to Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0813 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-18 - P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1279&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1279.pdf |