TN HB1276 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-09 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-09 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies circumstances under which a contractor can seek early release of a retainage held by a party with which the contractor has a written contract; makes other changes related to retainages for contractors. - Amends TCA Title 16, Chapter 15 and Title 66.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 16, Chapter 15 and Title 66, relative to retainages.
Sponsors
Rep. Clark Boyd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 4/9/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-02-20 | House | Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Commerce Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 2/20/2024 |
2023-04-04 | House | Action def. in Commerce Committee to Third Calendar of 2024 |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-28 | House | Action def. in Commerce Committee to 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/14/2023 |
2023-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2023-02-22 | House | Sponsor change. |
2023-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1201 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-21 - Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee