TN HB1276 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies the responsibility of the Tennessee Regulatory Authority to preserve universal service consisting of basic local exchange telephone service at comparable rates and carrier of last resort obligations for rural incumbent local exchange telephone companies and telephone cooperatives. - Amends TCA Title 65.
Title
As introduced, clarifies the responsibility of the Tennessee Regulatory Authority to preserve universal service consisting of basic local exchange telephone service at comparable rates and carrier of last resort obligations for rural incumbent local exchange telephone companies and telephone cooperatives. - Amends TCA Title 65.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Withdrawn. | |
2011-03-01 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Commerce | |
2011-02-23 | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1576 (Crossfiled) 2011-02-24 - P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1276&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB1276.pdf |