TN HB1275 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the information systems council to assess the feasibility of incorporating the recommendations of the open data task force into the council's policy guidelines for the overall management of the state's information systems. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 10 and Title 12.
Title
As introduced, requires the information systems council to assess the feasibility of incorporating the recommendations of the open data task force into the council's policy guidelines for the overall management of the state's information systems. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 10 and Title 12.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1034 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee