TN HB1274 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Re-refer to Senate State & Local Govt. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Re-refer to Senate State & Local Govt. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands the attorney general and reporter's duties to include representation of an LEA or certain LEA employees in a court or administrative tribunal arising out of the adoption of a policy requiring students, faculty, and staff to utilize the restroom, locker room, or other facility that corresponds to that individual's biological sex. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, expands the attorney general and reporter's duties to include representation of an LEA or certain LEA employees in a court or administrative tribunal arising out of the adoption of a policy requiring students, faculty, and staff to utilize the restroom, locker room, or other facility that corresponds to that individual's biological sex. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Holt [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Mark Cochran [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate State & Local Govt. Comm. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0403) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-30 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 72, Nays 23, PNV 1 |
2019-04-30 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0353) |
2019-04-30 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0492) |
2019-04-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1499 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Companion House Bill substituted