TN HB1274 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires any local government that proposes to issue indebtedness on or after July 1, 2013, to obtain approval of the state funding board, under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8 and Title 9.
Title
As introduced, requires any local government that proposes to issue indebtedness on or after July 1, 2013, to obtain approval of the state funding board, under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8 and Title 9.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/20/2013 |
2013-02-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2013-02-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | P1C. |
2013-02-14 | House | Intro. |
2013-02-14 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0275 (Crossfiled) 2013-01-31 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1274&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB1274.pdf |