TN HB1265 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Fair Accountability and Clarity in Tax Subsidies Act." - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Fair Accountability and Clarity in Tax Subsidies Act." - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 67.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-03-19HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-12HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 3/12/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Business Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Commerce Committee
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0513 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-19 - Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
SB1293 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-19 - Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/26/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback