TN HB1258 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-10 - Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to next calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-10 - Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to next calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the "Tennessee Second Look Commission." - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 3.
Title
As introduced, creates the "Tennessee Second Look Commission." - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-10 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to next calendar | |
2009-06-09 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/10/2009 | |
2009-06-09 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to next calendar | |
2009-06-03 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/08/2009 | |
2009-06-02 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to next calendar | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/02/2009 | |
2009-05-21 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-05-20 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 05/20/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Government Operations Committee | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 05/13/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 5/13/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 5/6/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 04/29/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 4/29/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 04/15/2009 | |
2009-02-24 | Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2009-02-19 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary--Government Operations | |
2009-02-18 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1534 (Crossfiled) 2009-06-18 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1258&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1258.pdf |