TN HB1254 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Failed in Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Failed in Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires law enforcement agencies and departments to compile certain information on crimes involving firearms and submit the information annually to the Tennessee bureau of investigation, which then compiles a report of the information for distribution to the members of the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 38 and Title 39.
Title
As introduced, requires law enforcement agencies and departments to compile certain information on crimes involving firearms and submit the information annually to the Tennessee bureau of investigation, which then compiles a report of the information for distribution to the members of the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 38 and Title 39.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | Failed in Civil Justice Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1402 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-13 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee