TN HB1252 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 873
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 873
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that marijuana concentrates and oils are included in the definition of marijuana. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Title
As enacted, specifies that marijuana concentrates and oils are included in the definition of marijuana. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Sparks [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Pub. Ch. 873 | |
2016-05-02 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2016 | |
2016-04-27 | Signed by Governor. | |
2016-04-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-22 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0951) |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-04-14 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2016-04-14 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-04-14 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0982) |
2016-04-13 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2016 |
2016-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-06 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/6/2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Health Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/15/2016 |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee--Health Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1189 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 873