TN HB1251 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a county election commission from transmitting an application to vote absentee to a voter unless the voter makes a request for the ballot in writing. - Amends TCA Section 2-6-202.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 2-6-202, relative to the election process.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0835 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee