TN HB1243 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases gasoline and diesel tax rates and allocates revenues to highway fund; authorizes local option gasoline tax and surcharge; increases registration fees; creates transportation services district consisting of certain counties; authorizes special allocation of surplus state tax revenue within district to eligible counties for transportation services; extends Class C misdemeanor offense of consuming an alcoholic beverage or possessing an open alcoholic beverage container in an operating motor vehicle to passengers. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9; Title 54; Title 55 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, increases gasoline and diesel tax rates and allocates revenues to highway fund; authorizes local option gasoline tax and surcharge; increases registration fees; creates transportation services district consisting of certain counties; authorizes special allocation of surplus state tax revenue within district to eligible counties for transportation services; extends Class C misdemeanor offense of consuming an alcoholic beverage or possessing an open alcoholic beverage container in an operating motor vehicle to passengers. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9; Title 54; Title 55 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/8/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 3/8/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee-- Finance, Ways & Means |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1107 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee