TN HB1241 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Action Def. in s/c State Government of S&LG to 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Action Def. in s/c State Government of S&LG to 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that employer disclosure reports be filed within 45 days following conclusion of the six-month periods ending "June 30 and December 31," instead of "March 31 and September 30." - Amends TCA Title 3.
Title
As introduced, requires that employer disclosure reports be filed within 45 days following conclusion of the six-month periods ending "June 30 and December 31," instead of "March 31 and September 30." - Amends TCA Title 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Action Def. in s/c State Government of S&LG to 2010 | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on s/c cal State Government of S&LG for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-02-24 | Assigned to s/c State Government of S&LG | |
2009-02-19 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government | |
2009-02-18 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1241&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1241.pdf |