TN HB1238 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - Sponsor change.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the attorney general and reporter to post online a listing of all current litigation that could impact the interpretation of this state's constitution in which this state is a party; requires the attorney general and reporter to post an annual report online of such litigation resulting in a final disposition. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 6, relative to the attorney general and reporter.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-10HouseSponsor change.
2024-01-10HouseSponsor(s) withdrawn.
2023-04-10HouseSponsor change.
2023-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2023-02-02HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0947 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-28 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback