TN HB1232 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Conference Committee appointed. (Watson, Johnson, Yager, Yarbro)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, reduces the amount of time from 30 to 21 days a lobbyist or an employer of a lobbyist has to notify the Tennessee ethics commission following an in-state event to which invitations were extended to the entire membership of the general assembly and thus not subject to the prohibition on gifts. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, reduces the amount of time from 30 to 21 days a lobbyist or an employer of a lobbyist has to notify the Tennessee ethics commission following an in-state event to which invitations were extended to the entire membership of the general assembly and thus not subject to the prohibition on gifts. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 3.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02SenateConference Committee appointed. (Watson, Johnson, Yager, Yarbro)
2019-05-02HouseConf. comm. appointed. ( M.Hill, Smith, Holt, Miller)
2019-05-02HouseH. refused to recede from its non-concurrence
2019-05-02SenateSenate refused to recede from amendment 1
2019-05-02HouseH. nonconcurred in S. am. no. 1
2019-05-02SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 3, PNV 2
2019-05-02SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0351)
2019-05-02SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-05-01SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-05-01HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-05-01HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 2
2019-05-01HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0241)
2019-04-30HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar #2 for 4/30/2019
2019-04-30HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/30/2019
2019-04-02HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 4/2/2019
2019-03-27HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee
2019-03-21HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20HouseAssigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee
2019-03-20HouseRef. to State Committee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1231 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-02 - Companion House Bill substituted

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback