TN HB1230 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires notice of filing of a condemnation petition to be by certified mail return receipt requested; requires notice to include certain statements concerning respondent's rights to contest or appeal condemnation proceedings; awards respondent costs for damages or destruction to property if condemnation is abandoned or unsuccessful; increases, from 30 days to 90 days, notice of the filing of a petition to institute condemnation proceedings before additional steps may be taken. - Amends TCA Title 29.
Title
As introduced, requires notice of filing of a condemnation petition to be by certified mail return receipt requested; requires notice to include certain statements concerning respondent's rights to contest or appeal condemnation proceedings; awards respondent costs for damages or destruction to property if condemnation is abandoned or unsuccessful; increases, from 30 days to 90 days, notice of the filing of a petition to institute condemnation proceedings before additional steps may be taken. - Amends TCA Title 29.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1371 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1230&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1230.pdf |