TN HB1230 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires LEA to use years of service acquired as a charter school teacher for tenure decisions upon return of the teacher to the LEA; permits public charter school teacher on leave of absence from an LEA to continue in the Tennessee consolidated retirement system. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 13.
Title
As introduced, requires LEA to use years of service acquired as a charter school teacher for tenure decisions upon return of the teacher to the LEA; permits public charter school teacher on leave of absence from an LEA to continue in the Tennessee consolidated retirement system. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 13.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Education Committee |
2013-04-02 | House | Action Def. in Education Committee to 4/3/2013 |
2013-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 4/2/2013 |
2013-03-26 | House | Action Def. in Education Committee to 4/2/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-19 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/19/2013 |
2013-02-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee |
2013-02-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | P1C. |
2013-02-14 | House | Intro. |
2013-02-14 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1287 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-14 - Ref. to S. Ed. Comm.