TN HB1226 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds two members to the advisory committee on open government, one senator to be appointed by the speaker of the senate and one representative to be appointed by the speaker of the house. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8, Chapter 4; Title 8, Chapter 44 and Title 10, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, adds two members to the advisory committee on open government, one senator to be appointed by the speaker of the senate and one representative to be appointed by the speaker of the house. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8, Chapter 4; Title 8, Chapter 44 and Title 10, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
Rep. Glen Casada [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0093 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee