TN SB0093 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds two members to the advisory committee on open government, one senator to be appointed by the speaker of the senate and one representative to be appointed by the speaker of the house. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8, Chapter 4; Title 8, Chapter 44 and Title 10, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, adds two members to the advisory committee on open government, one senator to be appointed by the speaker of the senate and one representative to be appointed by the speaker of the house. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8, Chapter 4; Title 8, Chapter 44 and Title 10, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. S&L Govt. Comm 3/17/20 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1226 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.