TN HB1226 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-24 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-24 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that an ignition interlock device be installed on all motor vehicles driven by DUI offenders; installation for one year for first conviction, two years for second conviction, three years for third conviction, and life of offender for fourth or subsequent conviction; allows person sentenced to have interlock device for life to petition for removal five years after date of conviction and every five years thereafter. - Amends TCA Section 55-10-403.
Title
As introduced, requires that an ignition interlock device be installed on all motor vehicles driven by DUI offenders; installation for one year for first conviction, two years for second conviction, three years for third conviction, and life of offender for fourth or subsequent conviction; allows person sentenced to have interlock device for life to petition for removal five years after date of conviction and every five years thereafter. - Amends TCA Section 55-10-403.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-24 | Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2009-02-19 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary | |
2009-02-18 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1637 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-18 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1226&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1226.pdf |