TN HB1218 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-12 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-12 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the department of human services from seeking, applying for, accepting, or renewing a federal waiver of work requirements for adults in the supplemental nutrition assistance program. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, prohibits the department of human services from seeking, applying for, accepting, or renewing a federal waiver of work requirements for adults in the supplemental nutrition assistance program. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Hicks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 4/12/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0505 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee