TN HB1215 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-05 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-05 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner of human services to study and report recommendations to the health and welfare committee of the senate and the health committee of the house of representatives concerning options for reducing or prohibiting the purchase of harmful products with no or little nutritional value by recipients of benefits under the supplemental nutrition assistance program. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, requires the commissioner of human services to study and report recommendations to the health and welfare committee of the senate and the health committee of the house of representatives concerning options for reducing or prohibiting the purchase of harmful products with no or little nutritional value by recipients of benefits under the supplemental nutrition assistance program. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Hicks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0504 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-29 - Deferred to Summer Study