TN HB1213 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the suspension of a person’s driver license as a result of the person's failure to timely pay litigation taxes, court costs, and fines assessed as a result of disposition of any criminal offense. - Amends TCA Title 40 and Title 55.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40 and Title 55, relative to driver licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0649 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee