TN HB1202 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-17 - Pub. Ch. 389
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-17 - Pub. Ch. 389
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits surveillance cameras on federal interstate highways, except for Smart Way cameras, other intelligent transportation system cameras or, when employees of the department of transportation or construction workers are present, surveillance cameras used to enforce or monitor traffic violations within work zones designated by the department; provided, that such cameras may be operated only by a state entity; imposes certain requirements on a state agency or political subdivision of the state that installs, owns, operates, or maintains a traffic-control signal light located in an intersection that employs a surveillance camera for the enforcement or monitoring of traffic violations.
Title
As enacted, prohibits surveillance cameras on federal interstate highways, except for Smart Way cameras, other intelligent transportation system cameras or, when employees of the department of transportation or construction workers are present, surveillance cameras used to enforce or monitor traffic violations within work zones designated by the department; provided, that such cameras may be operated only by a state entity; imposes certain requirements on a state agency or political subdivision of the state that installs, owns, operates, or maintains a traffic-control signal light located in an intersection that employs a surveillance camera for the enforcement or monitoring of traffic violations.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe McCord [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-06-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-17 | Pub. Ch. 389 | |
2009-06-17 | Effective date(s) 06/09/09 | |
2009-06-09 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-06-08 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2009-06-08 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-06-04 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-06-03 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2009-06-02 | Passed S, Ayes 28, Nays 0, PNV 3 | |
2009-06-02 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2009-06-02 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2009-06-01 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2009-06-01 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 80, Nays 10, PNV 3 | |
2009-06-01 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 4 - HA0681) | |
2009-06-01 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - HA0680) | |
2009-06-01 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA0546) | |
2009-06-01 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0545) | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/1/2009 | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 05/27/2009 | |
2009-05-27 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 05/27/2009 | |
2009-05-27 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/27/2009 | |
2009-05-14 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-05-13 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 05/13/2009 | |
2009-05-05 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on s/c cal Public Safety of TR for 05/05/2009 | |
2009-04-28 | Action Def. in s/c Public Safety of TR to 5/5/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on s/c cal Public Safety of TR for 04/28/2009 | |
2009-04-21 | Action Def. in s/c Public Safety of TR to 4/28/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on s/c cal Public Safety of TR for 04/21/2009 | |
2009-02-24 | Assigned to s/c Public Safety of TR | |
2009-02-19 | P2C, ref. to Transportation | |
2009-02-18 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1502 (Crossfiled) 2009-06-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 389