TN HB1196 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 407
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 407
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Educators Protection Act". - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 16; Title 28; Title 29; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 49.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Educators Protection Act". - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 16; Title 28; Title 29; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. Courtney Rogers [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Martin Daniel [R] |
Rep. Sheila Butt [R] | Rep. John Crawford [R] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. Marc Gravitt [R] |
Rep. Dennis Powers [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Judd Matheny [R] | Rep. Matthew Hill [R] |
Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. David Byrd [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Jimmy Eldridge [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 407 | |
2017-05-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-05-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2017 |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/26/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2017 |
2017-04-25 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-04-25 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/25/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-11 | House | Action def. in Civil Justice Committee to 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-02-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee--Education Administration & Planning |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0729 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 407