TN HB1167 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 308
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 308
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that liquefied natural gas motor fuel be sold in diesel gallon equivalents and that compressed natural gas motor fuel be sold in gasoline gallon equivalents or diesel gallon equivalents; requires the commissioner of agriculture to promulgate rules that are necessary to establish conversion units from mass to gasoline gallon equivalents and from mass to diesel gallon equivalents. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 26.
Title
As enacted, requires that liquefied natural gas motor fuel be sold in diesel gallon equivalents and that compressed natural gas motor fuel be sold in gasoline gallon equivalents or diesel gallon equivalents; requires the commissioner of agriculture to promulgate rules that are necessary to establish conversion units from mass to gasoline gallon equivalents and from mass to diesel gallon equivalents. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 26.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 308 | |
2015-04-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-15 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-04-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/9/2015 |
2015-04-02 | House | Action def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 4/9/2015 |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/2/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-17 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/17/2015 |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1172 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 308
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1167&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1167.pdf |