TN HB1146 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the number of free plates from one to two for the Purple Heart and disabled veteran license plates issued to veterans with disabilities. - Amends TCA Section 55-4-256 and Section 55-4-257.
Title
As introduced, increases the number of free plates from one to two for the Purple Heart and disabled veteran license plates issued to veterans with disabilities. - Amends TCA Section 55-4-256 and Section 55-4-257.
Sponsors
Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Lowell Russell [R] | Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] |
Rep. Dave Wright [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-02-21 | House | Reassigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-02-19 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/19/2020 |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/24/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-03-12 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/12/2019 |
2019-03-05 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0852 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 2/4/2020