TN HB1144 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-22 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-22 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows a person seeking administrative review of the department of human services actions involving child support enforcement to file a written request for review within 20 days of receiving notice of the action, rather than 15 days. - Amends TCA Title 36.
Title
As introduced, allows a person seeking administrative review of the department of human services actions involving child support enforcement to file a written request for review within 20 days of receiving notice of the action, rather than 15 days. - Amends TCA Title 36.
Sponsors
Rep. Glen Casada [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Meeting Cancelled. Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/22/17 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/15/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0440 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-09 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee