TN HB1144 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, declares that water companies shall not be prevented from providing water and wastewater treatment authorities with information about water customers to locate such persons or to collect delinquent debts; increases authority of municipalities to collect delinquent or past due sewer charges; expands ability of water and wastewater authorities to discontinue water service to sewer users who are delinquent in paying sewer service charges, penalties or fees. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5 and Title 68, Chapter 221.
Title
As introduced, declares that water companies shall not be prevented from providing water and wastewater treatment authorities with information about water customers to locate such persons or to collect delinquent debts; increases authority of municipalities to collect delinquent or past due sewer charges; expands ability of water and wastewater authorities to discontinue water service to sewer users who are delinquent in paying sewer service charges, penalties or fees. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5 and Title 68, Chapter 221.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/24/2015 |
2015-02-26 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1129 (Crossfiled) 2015-02-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1144&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1144.pdf |