TN HB1136 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Def. to Summer Study in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, increases, from two to three days, the permit expiration grace period for a holder of a fireworks permit. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 104.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 68, Chapter 104, relative to fireworks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-28HouseDef. to Summer Study in Commerce Committee
2023-03-22HousePlaced on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/28/2023
2023-03-21HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee
2023-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/21/2023
2023-03-14HouseAssigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee
2023-03-14HouseRef. to Commerce Committee
2023-02-02HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0913 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-21 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback