TN HB1125 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, increases from seven to 14 days the period within which an applicant for a charitable solicitation registration may request a hearing following receipt of notification that the applicant has not satisfied the registration requirements. - Amends TCA Title 48, Chapter 101, Part 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 48, Chapter 101, Part 5, relative to charitable solicitations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-15HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee
2023-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/15/2023
2023-03-07HouseAssigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
2023-03-07HouseRef. to State Government Committee
2023-02-02HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1328 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback