TN HB1123 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each county clerk to maintain an updated copy of the revenue docket containing all sources of county revenue in a separate location within the clerk's office. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 51, Part 1; Title 5; Title 6, Chapter 56; Title 7; Title 9; Title 12, Chapter 4, Part 2; Title 37, Chapter 5, Part 3; Title 39, Chapter 14; Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 7; Title 58, Chapter 7; Title 66, Chapter 34, Part 1; Title 67, Chapter 5, Part 1 and Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 7.
Title
As introduced, requires each county clerk to maintain an updated copy of the revenue docket containing all sources of county revenue in a separate location within the clerk's office. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 51, Part 1; Title 5; Title 6, Chapter 56; Title 7; Title 9; Title 12, Chapter 4, Part 2; Title 37, Chapter 5, Part 3; Title 39, Chapter 14; Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 7; Title 58, Chapter 7; Title 66, Chapter 34, Part 1; Title 67, Chapter 5, Part 1 and Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 7.
Sponsors
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee--Civil Justice |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1302 (Crossfiled) 2015-02-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1123&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1123.pdf |