TN HB1118 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal. in Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, revises provisions governing "base tax revenues" under the Convention Center and Tourism Development Financing Act of 1998. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 88.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7, Chapter 88, relative to tourism development.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-21HouseTaken off notice for cal. in Local Government Committee
2023-03-15HousePlaced on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/21/2023
2023-03-15HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
2023-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/15/2023
2023-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee
2023-02-13HouseRef. to Local Government Committee
2023-02-02HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1415 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-21 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee to first calendar of 2024

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback