TN HB1109 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 286
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 286
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds to the offense of custodial interference, a parent or other family member who harbors or hides a child within or outside this state, knowing that the child has been placed in the custody of the department of children's services pursuant to a protective custody order or an emergency custody order entered by a court; states that it is not a defense that the person harboring or hiding the child has not been served with an actual copy of a protective custody order or emergency custody order. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 6 and Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36, Chapter 6 and Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 3, relative to custodial interference.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 286 | |
2023-04-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-13 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2023-04-06 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/13/2023 |
2023-04-06 | House | Action def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 4/13/2023 |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/6/2023 |
2023-04-04 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-04-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1319 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-04 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023