TN HB1096 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 95
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 95
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions of the Charitable Gift Annuities Exemption Act. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 52.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions of the Charitable Gift Annuities Exemption Act. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 52.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Marsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - (VOICE VOTE) COMMERCE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-23 - House - (VOICE VOTE) COMMERCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Commerce Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - (VOICE VOTE) COMMERCE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-23 - House - (VOICE VOTE) COMMERCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Commerce Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 95 | |
2011-04-04 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2011-03-31 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2011 | |
2011-03-29 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/29/2011 | |
2011-03-23 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on s/c cal Commerce Subcommittee for 3/23/2011 | |
2011-02-23 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Commerce | |
2011-02-23 | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-15 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0892 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-28 - Pub. Ch. 95