TN HB1075 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 1034
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 1034
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the county legislative body of a county that has enacted county-wide zoning to create a design review committee (DRC). - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the county legislative body of a county that has enacted county-wide zoning to create a design review committee (DRC). - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-10 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-14 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State & Local Government Commit (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-10 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-14 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State & Local Government Commit (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 1034 | |
2012-05-29 | Effective date(s) 05/21/12 | |
2012-05-21 | Signed by Governor. | |
2012-05-09 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2012-05-08 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-05-03 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-05-03 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2012-04-27 | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1, Ayes 86, Nays 1 | |
2012-04-26 | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/27/2012 | |
2012-04-26 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 25, Nays 1, PNV 2 | |
2012-04-26 | S. adopted am. 1 | |
2012-04-26 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2012-04-25 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2012-04-25 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2012-04-25 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 99, Nays 0 | |
2012-04-25 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA1147) | |
2012-04-25 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0940) | |
2012-04-19 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/25/2012 | |
2012-04-18 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/19/2012 | |
2012-04-10 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-04-04 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/10/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-03-28 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 4/4/2012 | |
2012-03-28 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2012-03-20 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 3/20/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 3/14/2012 | |
2011-04-13 | Action Def. in s/c S&LG Subcommittee to 2012 | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 4/13/2011 | |
2011-02-22 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of S&LG | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-15 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1716 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-26 - Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA0726)