TN HB1074 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the penalty for assault of a first responder from a Class A misdemeanor to a Class E felony. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 13, relative to assault of a first responder.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 83 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-14 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-14 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 83, Nays 3, PNV 0 |
2021-04-14 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0133) |
2021-04-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2021 |
2021-03-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-17 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/17/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0358 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-16 - Sponsor(s) Added.