TN HB1061 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases penalty for speeding in marked school zone from Class C misdemeanor to Class B misdemeanor; designates $50.00 of such enhanced penalty to be used by TDOT for grants for safe pathways for students. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8.
Title
As introduced, increases penalty for speeding in marked school zone from Class C misdemeanor to Class B misdemeanor; designates $50.00 of such enhanced penalty to be used by TDOT for grants for safe pathways for students. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Haynes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee | |
2012-03-21 | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-20 | Mtg. Cancelled Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 3/27/12 | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/20/2012 | |
2012-03-13 | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 3/20/2012 | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/13/2012 | |
2011-04-12 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 4/12/2011 | |
2011-04-05 | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 4/12/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 4/5/2011 | |
2011-03-22 | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 4/5/2011 | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/22/2011 | |
2011-02-22 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Transportation | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-15 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1083 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-03 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1061&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB1061.pdf |