TN HB1059 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes a provision that, in developing course equivalencies and awarding academic credits, required state institutions of higher education to submit such equivalencies to the Tennessee higher education commission (THEC) on or before December 15, 2018, detailing how academic credit toward the institution's respective credentials will be awarded. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2024-03-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-18 | House | Action Def. in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee to 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/18/2024 |
2024-03-11 | House | Action Def. in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee to 3/18/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/11/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2024-03-06 | House | Ref. to Education Administration |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0709 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-19 - Transmitted to Governor for action.