TN HB1042 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, allows an LEA that uses the career academy or small learning community model to extend career and technical education (CTE) class sizes in grades six through eight if the extended CTE class size does not exceed the maximum class size for general education classes in grades four through six; allows an LEA to seek a waiver from the commissioner of education to exceed the average CTE class size in grades six through eight. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 1, relative to class sizes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-22HouseWithdrawn.
2024-02-13HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration
2024-02-07HousePlaced on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/13/2024
2023-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
2023-02-02HouseP2C, ref. to Education Administration
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1123 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback