TN HB1042 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 467
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 467
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises the provisions governing the issuance of a self-distribution permit to a winery. - Amends TCA Section 57-3-207.
Title
As enacted, revises the provisions governing the issuance of a self-distribution permit to a winery. - Amends TCA Section 57-3-207.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 467 | |
2015-04-22 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-04-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2015 |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/21/2015 |
2015-04-21 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/21/2015 |
2015-04-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-04-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2015 |
2015-04-14 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-04-07 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/7/2015 |
2015-04-01 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/18/2015 |
2015-02-23 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1113 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-26 - Pub. Ch. 467
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1042&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1042.pdf |