TN HB1040 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Failed in Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, revises provisions governing the use of mobile electronic and communication devices at polling places. - Amends TCA Section 2-7-142.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, revises provisions governing the use of mobile electronic and communication devices at polling places. - Amends TCA Section 2-7-142.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - House - FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Failed in Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 10 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseFailed in Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-04-23HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-23HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/23/2018
2018-04-23HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-04-19HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/23/2018
2018-04-18HouseReset on Final cal. of Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2018-04-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/18
2018-04-04HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2018
2018-04-03HousePlaced behind the budget
2018-03-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2018
2017-05-08HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 1/1/2018
2017-05-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017
2017-04-26HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017
2017-04-26HousePlaced behind the budget
2017-04-19HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2017
2017-04-19HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2017-04-18HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-04-12HousePlaced on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/18/2017
2017-04-11HouseAction def. in Local Government Committee to 4/18/2017
2017-04-05HousePlaced on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/11/2017
2017-04-04HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
2017-03-29HousePlaced on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 4/4/2017
2017-02-15HouseAssigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
2017-02-15HouseP2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
2017-02-13HouseP1C.
2017-02-09HouseIntro.
2017-02-09HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0517 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-17 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback