TN HB1030 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - Pub. Ch. 492
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - Pub. Ch. 492
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts "The Virtual Public Schools Act." - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, enacts "The Virtual Public Schools Act." - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Conference Committee Report (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 6 BY Herron (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 5 BY Herron (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 4 BY Herron (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 65 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 61 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 59 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE AMENDMENT # 4 BY Stewart PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 59 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY Stewart PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 60 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 3 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 6 BY Herron (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 5 BY Herron (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 4 BY Herron (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 65 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 61 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 59 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE AMENDMENT # 4 BY Stewart PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 59 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY Stewart PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 60 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 3 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-21 | Pub. Ch. 492 | |
2011-06-21 | Effective date(s) 07/01/11 | |
2011-06-16 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-06-06 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2011-05-25 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-05-24 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-05-24 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2011-05-21 | Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 21, Nays 9 | |
2011-05-21 | Conf. comm. report adopted, Aye 65, Nays 19 | |
2011-05-21 | Conf. comm. appointed. (Gresham, Woodson, Burks) | |
2011-05-21 | H. refused to recede from its non-concurrence | |
2011-05-21 | Conf. comm. appointed. (H. Brooks, Windle & R. Williams) | |
2011-05-21 | S. refused to recede from am. 4 | |
2011-05-21 | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 4 cal. for 5/21/2011 | |
2011-05-21 | H. nonconcurred in S. am. no. 4 | |
2011-05-21 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 20, Nays 10 | |
2011-05-21 | S. adopted am. 4 | |
2011-05-21 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2011-05-21 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2011-05-21 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2011-05-21 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 61, Nays 26, PNV 1 | |
2011-05-21 | Am. no. 3 & 4 tabled. | |
2011-05-21 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA0552) | |
2011-05-21 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0327) | |
2011-05-20 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 3 for 5/20/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-19 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/17/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to 5/18/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 5/4/2011 | |
2011-04-26 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2011-04-26 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 4/26/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Education Committee | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 4/20/2011 | |
2011-04-06 | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 4/20/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 4/6/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Action def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 4/6/11 | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/30/2011 | |
2011-02-22 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Education | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to Education Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-15 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0874 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 492