TN HB1029 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-22 - Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-22 - Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends from one year to two years the amount of time for which a governing body that permits electronic communication between members over the internet must control the electronic archive. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 48.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8 and Title 48, relative to public meetings.
Sponsors
Rep. Jerome Moon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2022-03-22 | House | Ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0971 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee