TN SB0971 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends from one year to two years the amount of time for which a governing body that permits electronic communication between members over the internet must control the electronic archive. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 48.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8 and Title 48, relative to public meetings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/29/2021 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/29/2021 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Sponsor change. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1029 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-22 - Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee