TN HB1018 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the department of safety to conduct a name-based criminal history record check every four years after a person is issued a concealed handgun carry permit; permits the department to revoke the permit if the person is ineligible to possess a firearm; implements a $50 fee for renewal of the permit. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13, relative to concealed handgun carry permits.
Sponsors
Rep. Curtis Halford [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Jason Powell [D] | Rep. John Ragan [R] |
Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 78 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 78 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2022 | |
2022-05-09 | Pub. Ch. 1000 | |
2022-05-05 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-25 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-22 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 25, Nays 0 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0711) |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-04-19 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-04-18 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 78, Nays 12, PNV 1 |
2022-04-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-18 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0630) |
2022-04-14 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2022 |
2022-04-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/14/2022 |
2022-04-12 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/12/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/1/2022 |
2021-04-06 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0890 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1000