TN HB1000 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Pub. Ch. 655
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Pub. Ch. 655
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, renames the "Tennessee distinguished service medal" as the "Tennessee fallen heroes medal". - Amends TCA Section 8-30-306; Section 49-7-102; Title 58, Chapter 7; Title 58, Chapter 3 and Section 67-5-704.
Title
As enacted, renames the "Tennessee distinguished service medal" as the "Tennessee fallen heroes medal". - Amends TCA Section 8-30-306; Section 49-7-102; Title 58, Chapter 7; Title 58, Chapter 3 and Section 67-5-704.
Sponsors
Rep. Curry Todd [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-23 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-23 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Pub. Ch. 655 | |
2012-04-11 | Effective date(s) 04/04/12 | |
2012-04-04 | Signed by Governor. | |
2012-03-27 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2012-03-27 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-03-26 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-03-22 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2012-03-22 | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2012-03-22 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2012-03-01 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2012-02-27 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2012-02-27 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0 | |
2012-02-27 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0714) | |
2012-02-23 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/27/2012 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/23/2012 | |
2012-02-21 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 2/21/2012 | |
2012-02-14 | Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 2/21/2012 | |
2012-02-08 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 2/14/2012 | |
2011-04-05 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/5/2011 | |
2011-03-29 | Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 4/5/2011 | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/29/2011 | |
2011-03-23 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 3/23/2011 | |
2011-03-14 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2011-03-08 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 3/8/2011 | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-15 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1223 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 655