TN HB0989 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-02 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-02 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the state board for licensing contractors to post, within 15 days, instead of 30 days, of the board's action with regard to the board disciplining a contractor, home improvement services provider, or home improvement contractor, on the board's website information identifying the person, the violation, and the date a penalty was imposed. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 50; Title 62 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 50; Title 62 and Title 68, relative to professions.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Beck [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0770 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee