TN HB0969 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, allows courts to order a person into a program of assisted outpatient mental health treatment upon finding certain conditions are met; provides a process for certain persons to petition a court on behalf of a proposed patient; establishes criteria for the evaluation of proposed patients and reporting to the court by physicians and certain mental health professionals. - Amends TCA Title 33.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, allows courts to order a person into a program of assisted outpatient mental health treatment upon finding certain conditions are met; provides a process for certain persons to petition a court on behalf of a proposed patient; establishes criteria for the evaluation of proposed patients and reporting to the court by physicians and certain mental health professionals. - Amends TCA Title 33.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
2020-06-11HousePlaced behind the budget
2020-06-10HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 6/11/2020
2020-06-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/10/2020
2020-06-10HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2020-06-09HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2020-06-03HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 6/10/2020
2020-06-02HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
2020-05-27HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 6/2/2020
2020-03-17HouseMeeting Canceled
2020-03-11HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/17/2020
2020-03-10HouseAction def. in Health Committee to 3/17/2020
2020-03-04HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/10/2020
2020-02-28HouseRe-ref. to Health Committee
2019-04-16HouseReturned to the Clerk's Desk.
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 4/16/2019
2019-04-09HouseAction def. in Health Committee to 4/16/2019
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 4/9/2019
2019-04-03HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee-- Government Operations for Review
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1344 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback